We use some essential cookies to make this website work.
We’d like to set additional cookies to understand how you use GOV.UK, remember your settings and improve government services.
We also use cookies set by other sites to help us deliver content from their services.
You have accepted additional cookies. You can change your cookie settings at any time.
You have rejected additional cookies. You can change your cookie settings at any time.
Departments, agencies and public bodies
News stories, speeches, letters and notices
Detailed guidance, regulations and rules
Reports, analysis and official statistics
Consultations and strategy
Data, Freedom of Information releases and corporate reports
Civil Society Minister Tracey Crouch urges public to take part to help build a fairer society
First published during the 2016 to 2019 May Conservative government
The speech was delivered on Monday 26 February.
Former chair of Social Enterprise UK takes on the role
He spoke about how we will use the transformational power of digital technology to make the golden age between the UK and China even more golden
Arts minister steps in to prevent rare watercolour from export.
The Culture Secretary has reappointed Nigel Halkes as Deputy Chair of the VisitEngland Board for a second term of 4 years, from 13 January 2018 to 12 January 2020.
Church spires across the UK will be used to boost digital connectivity in rural areas following an agreement between the Government and the Church of England.
The Prime Minister has appointed Hugh Bullock and Andrew Figgures as Trustees of the Imperial War Museum for four years from 1 February 2018, and the The Secretary of State for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport has appointed…
The Secretary of State for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport appoints Moira Andrews, Liz Copper, Peter Gooderham and John Wood as Members of ACNRA.
Carol Brady has been appointed by the Secretary of State for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport as a Commissioner of the Gambling Commission, for 5 years from 1 February 2018.
Dr Ashok Roy, Kate de Rothschild-Agius and Tim Schroder have been reappointed by the Prime Minister as Trustees of the Wallace Collection for a term of five years, ending on 6 January 2023
The Culture Secretary has appointed Anne Panter as a member of the UK Sport Board for a term of 3 years, from 31 January 2018 to 01 February 2021.
The Culture Secretary has reappointed Samir Shah as Chair of the Geffrye Museum Board for a second term of 4 years, from 16 June 2018 to 15 June 2022.
The Prime Minister has announced plans to review laws and make sure that what is illegal offline is illegal online as the Government marks Safer Internet Day.
The Prime Minister has today launched a review to preserve the future of high quality national and local newspapers in the UK
Arts minister steps in to prevent extraordinary collection from export.
Delivered on Monday 5 February 2018
The Culture Secretary has reappointed Tim Eyles as Chair of the Theatres Trust Board for a second term of 3 years, from 1 February 2018 to 31 January 2021.
The Culture Secretary has reappointed Eve Salomon as Chair of the Horniman Museum Board for a second term of 4 years, from 14 July 2018 to 13 July 2022.
The Culture Secretary has reappointed Jane Kennedy and Sir David Cannadine as trustees of the Historic Royal Palaces Board for a second term of 3 years, from 19 May 2018 to 18 May 2021.
Don’t include personal or financial information like your National Insurance number or credit card details.
To help us improve GOV.UK, we’d like to know more about your visit today. Please fill in this survey (opens in a new tab).